list of chief minister since 1947 to 2019 in punjab
Answers
No Name Took Office Left Office Term Party
(coalition with) Election (Assembly) Appointed by Deputy Chief Minister
- Gian Singh Rarewala (caretaker) 15 July 1948 13 January 1949 2 years, 312 days IND
(SAD) - Yadavindra Singh None
1
Gian Singh Rarewala 13 January 1948 23 May 1951 [RES] -
2
Raghbir Singh 23 May 1951 21 April 1952 [RES] 334 days Indian National Congress - Brish Bhan
(1)
Gian Singh Rarewala 22 April 1952 [§] 5 March 1953[RES] 317 days IND
(UDF) 1952 (1) None
(i) Vacant[a]
(President's rule) 5 March 1953 8 March 1954 1 year, 3 days - - Rajendra Prasad
(2)
Raghbir Singh 8 March 1954 [§] 12 January 1955 [d] 310 days Indian National Congress 1954 (2) Yadavindra Singh Brish Bhan
3
Brish Bhan 12 January 1955 1 November 1956 [pd] 1 year, 294 days - (2
№ Name
(birth–death); constituency Portrait Party
(coalition with) Term of office[4] Elections
(Vidhan Sabha) Appointed by(Governor)
5 Giani Gurmukh Singh Musafir
(1899–1976)
MLC in Vidhan Parishad Giani Gurmukh Singh Musafir 2001 stamp of India.jpg Indian National Congress 1 November
1966 8 March
1967 127 days — (3rd) Dharma Vira
6 Gurnam Singh
(1899–1973)
MLA for Qila Raipur Gurnam Singh ex-CM Punjab India.jpg Akali Dal - Sant Fateh Singh
(BJS and CPI) 8 March
1967 25 November
1967[RES] 262 days 1967 (4th)
7 Lachhman Singh Gill
(1917–1969)
MLA for Dharamkot Shiromani Akali Dal
(INC) 25 November
1967 23 August
1968 272 days D. C. Pavate
(iii) Vacant[a]
(President's rule) None 23 August
1968 17 February
1969 178 days — Zakir Hussain
(6) Gurnam Singh
(1899–1973)
MLA for Qila Raipur Gurnam Singh ex-CM Punjab India.jpg Shiromani Akali Dal
(BJS) 17 February
1969[§] 27 March
1970[RES] 1 year, 38 days 1969 (5th) D. C. Pavate
8 Parkash Singh Badal
(born 1927)
MLA for Giddarbaha ParkashSinghBadal (cropped).JPG 27 March
1970 14 June
1971 1 year, 79 days
(iv) Vacant[a]
(President's rule) None 14 June
1971 17 March
1972 277 days — Varahagiri Venkata Giri
9 Zail Singh
(1916–1994)
MLA for Anandpur Sahib Indian National Congress 17 March
1972 30 April
1977 5 years, 44 days 1972 (6th) D. C. Pavate
(v) Vacant[a]
(President's rule) None 30 April
1977 20 June
1977 51 days — B. D. Jatti
(8) Parkash Singh Badal
(born 1927)
MLA for Giddarbaha ParkashSinghBadal (cropped).JPG Shiromani Akali Dal
(JP) 20 June
1977[§] 17 February
1980 2 years, 242 days 1977 (7th) Mahendra Mohan Choudhry
(vi) Vacant[a]
(President's rule) None 17 February
1980 6 June
1980 110 days — Neelam Sanjiva Reddy
10 Darbara Singh
(1916–1990)
MLA for Nakodar Indian National Congress (Indira) 6 June
1980 6 October
1983 3 years, 122 days 1980 (8th) Jaisukh lal Hathi
(vii) Vacant[a]
(President's rule) None 6 October
1983 29 September
1985 1 year, 358 days — Zail Singh
11 Surjit Singh Barnala
(1925—2017)
MLA for Barnala Surjith singh barnala (cropped).JPG Shiromani Akali Dal 29 September
1985 11 June
1987 1 year, 255 days 1985 (9th) Arjun Singh
(viii) Vacant[a]
(President's rule) None 11 June
1987 25 February
1992 4 years, 259 days — Zail Singh
12 Beant Singh
(1922–1995)
MLA for Jalandhar Cantonment Beant Singh 2013 stamp of India.jpg Indian National Congress (Indira) 25 February
1992 31 August
1995[†] 3 years, 187 days 1992 (10th) Surendra Nath
13 Harcharan Singh Brar
(1922–2009)
MLA for Muktsar 31 August
1995 21 November
1996[RES] 1 year, 82 days B.K.N. Chhibber
14 Rajinder Kaur Bhattal
(born 1945)
MLA for Lehra Rajinder Kaur Bhattal.jpg 21 November
1996 11 February
1997 82 days
(8) Parkash Singh Badal
(born 1927)
MLA for Lambi ParkashSinghBadal (cropped).JPG Shiromani Akali Dal
(BJP) 12 February
1997[§] 26 February
2002 5 years, 14 days 1997 (11th)
15 Amarinder Singh
(born 1942)
MLA for Patiala Town Amarinder Singh.jpg Indian National Congress 26 February
2002 1 March
2007 5 years, 3 days 2002 (12th) J. F. R. Jacob
(8) Parkash Singh Badal
(born 1927)
MLA for Lambi ParkashSinghBadal (cropped).JPG Shiromani Akali Dal
(BJP) 1 March
2007[§] 14 March
2012 10 years, 15 days 2007 (13th) S. F. Rodrigues
14 March
2012 16 March
2017 2012 (14th) Shivraj Patil
(15) Amarinder Singh
(born 1942)
MLA for Patiala Town Amarinder Singh.jpg Indian National Congress 16 March
2017[§] Incumbent 1 year, 320 days 2017 (15th) V. P. Singh Badnore